- Lola agbetunsin

# Math: Multiplication fun fact

Perfect Squares of two digit numbers that end with 5
Step 1 - multiply the first digit by the next consecutive integer
Step 2 - place 25 at the end of your result
**Lets try an example**
15 x15 = ?
Step 1 - the first digit is 1
the next consecutive integer after 1 is 2
1 x 2 = **2**
Step 2 - place 25 at the end of 2
this is **2**25
15 x 15 = 225
**Next example**
25 x 25= ?
step 1 - 2X3 = **6**
step 2 - **6**25
25 x 25 = 625
**Final example**
35 x 35=?
step 1 - 3 x 4 = **12**
step 2 -** 12**25
35 x 45 = 1225

**Practice these on your own, and verify with the use of a calculator**

45 x 45 =

55 x 55 =

65 x 65 =

75 x 75 =

85 x 85 =

95 x 95 =