- Lola agbetunsin

# Multiplication facts 11

**11 x "a two digit number"**

Step 1: let x represent the first digit and y represent the second digit. write a three digit answer in which the first digit "x" in the question is the first digit in the answer, and your second digit y in the question is your third digit in the answer. x _ y

Step 2: find the sum of x and y

Step 3: place the sum of x and y in the second digit position x **x+y** y

**Example 1:**
11 x 23
Step 1: 2 _ 3
Step 2: 2+3 = **5**
Step 3: 2**5**3
11X 23 = 253

**Example 2:**
11 x 34
Step 1: 3 _4
Step 2: 3+4 = **7**
Step 3: 3**7**4
11x 34 = 374

**Example 3:**

11 x 62 = __6__ ** 6+2**__ 2 __= 682

Try the following on your own and verify with the use of a calculator

11 x 45 =

11x 32 =

11x44 =

11 x 53 =