Math: Multiplication fun fact

August 12, 2019


Perfect Squares of two digit numbers that end with 5

Step 1 - multiply the first digit by the next consecutive integer
Step 2 - place 25 at the end of your result

Lets try an example

15 x15 = ?
Step 1 - the first digit is 1
the next consecutive integer after 1 is 2
1 x 2 = 2
Step 2 - place 25 at the end of 2
this is 225
15 x 15 = 225

Next example
25 x 25= ?
step 1 - 2X3 = 6
step 2 - 625
25 x 25 = 625

Final example
35 x 35=?
step 1 - 3 x 4 = 12
step 2 - 1225
35 x 45 = 1225



Practice these on your own, and verify with the use of a calculator

 

45 x 45 =

55 x 55 =

65 x 65 =

75 x 75 =

85 x 85 =

95 x 95 =

Please reload

Featured Posts

Before I answer this question, let me ask you a question first. Do you know a high school graduate, or college student, who can not multiply or add wi...

Do students need private tutoring to be competitive?

April 26, 2016

1/1
Please reload

Recent Posts

August 12, 2019

August 12, 2019

August 12, 2019

Please reload

Archive
Please reload

Search By Tags
Please reload

Follow Us
  • Facebook Basic Square
  • Twitter Basic Square
  • Google+ Basic Square

OPENING HOURS

 

Monday-Friday 8:00am-9:00pm

Saturday-Sunday 8:00am-9:00pm

 

  • Twitter Basic Black
  • Instagram Basic Black

ADDRESS

 

Clair del Avenue, Long Beach, CA 90807

lolaa@greatmindsacademictutoring.com

Tel: 1(562)-346-8867

Great Minds Academic Tutoring © 2016